OR SB722 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Human Services for deposit in Oregon Project Independence Fund. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to Oregon Project Independence; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Brian Boquist [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] |
Sen. Alan Olsen [R] | Sen. Chuck Thomsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Human Services and Early Childhood, then Ways and Means. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB722 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB722/Introduced |