OR SB720 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to establish, in collaboration with Department of Corrections, Family Preservation Project pilot program at Coffee Creek Correctional Facility. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to establish, in collaboration with Department of Corrections, Family Preservation Project pilot program at Coffee Creek Correctional Facility. Provides that program shall be administered by YWCA of Greater Portland. Specifies goals of program and services that may be provided. Requires commission to perform analysis of program and report results of analysis to Legislative Assembly beginning September 15, 2024, and every two years thereafter. Appropriates moneys to Oregon Criminal Justice Commission for distribution to YWCA of Greater Portland for purposes of program. Sunsets program on January 1, 2029. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to the Family Preservation Project; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation, then Ways and Means. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |