OR SB720 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands crime of official misconduct in the first degree to include certain acts by persons responsible for approving licensing or certification application for provision of care to vulnerable persons. Punishes by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.
Title
Relating to official misconduct.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session cancelled. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Ways and Means. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB720 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB720/Introduced |