OR SB72 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates certain duties of Oregon Department of Administrative Services and other state agencies related to tracking and reporting of travel awards earned as part of official state business. Permits department to rent space other than office quarters to public or private persons at market rates. Consolidates multiple statutes relating to rental by department of unused space. Adjusts definition of "office building" for purposes of certain public facilities laws to include portions of buildings. Provides that exemption for state agencies from local parking code requirements extends to newly acquired buildings in addition to newly constructed or renovated buildings. Standardizes definitions of "state agency" used in portions of laws related to administration of public funds. Modifies references to discontinued Consumer Price Index in certain statutes.] Modifies duties of department relating to telecommuting of state employees.
Title
Relating to the administration of state agencies.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 278, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-29 | House | Third reading. Carried by Nosse. Passed. Ayes, 53; Nays, 7--Barreto, Findley, Lewis, Nearman, Reschke, Smith DB, Wilson. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-03-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Vote explanation filed by Boquist. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 22; Nays, 8--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum, Thomsen. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |