OR SB719 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority or local public health administrator to release aggregate information about reportable disease investigations that does not identify individual cases or sources of information, upon receipt of public records request. Provides that certain aggregate data relating to reportable disease investigations are not confidential or exempt from disclosure under public records law unless data could reasonably lead to identification of individual.] Directs Oregon Health Authority or local public health administrator to release aggregate information about reportable disease investigations that does not identify individual cases or sources of information, upon receipt of public records request. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to reportable diseases; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |