OR SB719 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Passed on June 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-06 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes basis and permissible scope of assessments by Oregon Sheep Commission.
Title
Relating to Oregon Sheep Commission assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-06 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Chapter 308, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-04 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-05-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Clem. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 10--Cameron, Freeman, Gilliam, Hanna, Hicks, Komp, McLane, Olson, Thatcher, Weidner; Excused, 3--Buckley, Gorsek, Whitsett. |
2013-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 21, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-16 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-15 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Natural Resources. |
2013-04-03 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Whitsett. Passed. Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Boquist, Devlin. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |