OR SB716 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, June 3, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, June 3, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Includes child care needs as reason employee may identify as limitation or change in employee's work schedule availability. Requires employers to reasonably accommodate employee's work schedule availability related to child care.] Includes child care needs as reason employee may identify as limitation or change in employee's work schedule availability. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to work scheduling; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, June 3, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 176, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-27 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Schouten. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 4--Bonham, Morgan, Nearman, Reschke; Excused, 1--Hayden; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bynum. |
2021-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-20 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-19 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-17 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Early Childhood. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |