OR SB713 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 15, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits public or private post-secondary institution of education from requiring prospective student to disclose whether prospective student has criminal conviction before institution makes final determination on whether to admit student. Prohibits public or private post-secondary institution of education from requiring prospective student to disclose whether prospective student has criminal conviction before institution makes final determination on whether to admit student. Requires materials or websites created by institution that are routinely used by prospective students when deciding whether to apply for admission to include notification to prospective students if institution determined that particular course, apprenticeship, program, major or degree pathway is likely to lead to professional licensure requirements that may exclude individuals with criminal convictions. Exempts from requirements any course, apprenticeship, program, major or degree pathway at institution where applicants apply via direct entry and institution has determined that individuals with criminal backgrounds are likely to encounter barriers to licensure or practicum placements. Requires that any course, apprenticeship, program, major or degree pathway that uses exemption to deny admission to applicant based on prior criminal conviction must notify applicant and allow applicant to appeal decision under formal process established by institution. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to applying to post-secondary institutions of education; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, June 15, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 341, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 16; Nays, 13--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Sollman. Passed. Ayes, 31; Nays, 20--Bonham, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Hayden, Leif, Levy, Lewis, Moore-Green, Morgan, Noble, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Stark, Wallan, Weber, Wright, Zika; Excused, 4--Clem, Drazan, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Campos, Rayfield, Salinas. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Education. |
2021-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed. Ayes, 17; Nays, 10--Anderson, Findley, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Johnson, Kennemer, Knopp, Robinson, Thomsen; Absent, 1--Boquist; Excused, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |