OR SB710 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, September 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, September 1, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies allowed and prohibited uses of restraint of children in care by certain programs. Modifies allowed and prohibited uses of restraint of children in care by certain programs. Directs certain facilities to establish procedures to be followed when child in care is placed in restraint or involuntary seclusion. Prescribes reporting requirements following administration of restraint or involuntary seclusion. Requires certain programs to submit quarterly reports to Department of Human Services regarding use of restraints and involuntary seclusion on children in care. Directs department to adopt rules for individuals to be certified in administration of restraints and involuntary seclusion. Requires provision of information to children in care regarding how to report suspected inappropriate use of restraint or involuntary seclusion. Modifies definition of "developmental disabilities residential facility." Defines "secure transportation services provider." Requires person or organization making referral related to use of secure transportation services provider to provide referral disclosure. Requires secure transportation services provider that transports children on highways of this state along route beginning or ending in this state to or from certain schools, agencies, organizations or programs located in this state or any other state to be licensed by department as child-caring agency. Increases specified appropriations from General Fund to Department of Human Services for biennium beginning July 1, 2021, for purposes of carrying out Act. Increases specified limitations on expenditures by department for biennium beginning July 1, 2021, for purposes of carrying out Act. Declares emergency, effective on passage] September 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to children in care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, September 1, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 672, 2021 Laws. |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-07-01 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 3--Dexter, Smith G, Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Bonham. |
2021-06-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-24 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Kennemer, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-13 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session not held. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |