OR SB707 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, July 14, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Human Services to provide certain notices to children and wards whom department placed in out-of-state residential facilities between January 1, 2016, and June 30, 2020, and upon request to provide representatives of children and wards with certain documentation and information. Directs Department of Human Services to provide certain notices to children and wards whom department placed in out-of-state residential facilities between January 1, 2016, and June 30, 2020, and upon request to provide representatives of children and wards with certain documentation and information. Directs department to obtain records from out-of-state residential facilities in which department placed child or ward between January 1, 2016, and June 30, 2020. Requires department to retain records for 20 years. Sunsets January 2, 2022] 2043. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to notices to children placed in out-of-state residential facilities; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Sara Gelser Blouin [D] | Sen. Deb Patterson [D] | Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] |
Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Marshall Wilde [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | Senate | Effective date, July 14, 2021. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Chapter 492, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 2--Bonham, Smith G. |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session not held. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |