OR SB706 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide grant to organization for purpose of conducting outreach to citizens of island nations in Compact of Free Association residing in Oregon to enroll citizens of island nations in Compact of Free Association in medical assistance. Requires Oregon Health Authority to provide grant to organization for purpose of conducting outreach to citizens of island nations in Compact of Free Association residing in Oregon to enroll citizens of island nations in Compact of Free Association in medical assistance. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to enrolling citizens of the island nations in the Compact of Free Association in the state medical assistance program; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |