OR SB706 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Department of Education to administer pilot program to provide professional development and instructional resources to component school districts through education service districts. Sunsets pilot program on January 2, 2020. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to an education service district pilot program; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] | Rep. Margaret Doherty [D] | Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Bill Kennemer [R] |
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB706 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB706/Introduced |