OR SB705 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds two members who are physician assistants or retired physician assistants and one additional public member to membership of Oregon Medical Board. Adds two members who are physician assistants or retired physician assistants and one additional public member to membership of Oregon Medical Board. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to membership of the Oregon Medical Board; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |