OR SB704 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that discovery of victim's actual or perceived gender, gender identity, gender expression or sexual orientation does not constitute reasonable explanation for extreme emotional disturbance for purposes of affirmative defense to murder in the second degree. Provides that discovery of victim's actual or perceived gender, gender identity, gender expression or sexual orientation does not constitute reasonable explanation for extreme emotional disturbance for purposes of affirmative defense to murder in the second degree. Provides that person is not justified in using physical force upon other person if person would not have used physical force but for discovery of other person's actual or perceived gender, gender identity, gender expression or sexual orientation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting defenses based on certain characteristics of the victim.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-06-10SenateChapter 84, 2021 Laws.
2021-05-21SenateGovernor signed.
2021-05-17HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-05-14SenatePresident signed.
2021-05-13HouseThird reading. Carried by Power. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 5--Clem, Hayden, Lively, Nearman, Stark; Excused for Business of the House, 1--McLain.
2021-05-12HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 13, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-11HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-11HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-06HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-20HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-15HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-14SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard.
2021-04-14SenateThird reading. Carried by Wagner. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard.
2021-04-12SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-12SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-25SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-04SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-17SenatePublic Hearing Cancelled.
2021-01-27SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-22SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback