OR SB704 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows for additional weights in state school fund distributions for historically underserved students who have made specified progress in ninth grade. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to State School Fund distributions for students in the ninth grade; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Hass [D] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Rep. Mark Johnson [R] | Rep. Betty Komp [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Finance and Revenue. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB704 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB704/Introduced |