OR SB703 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Adds direct care worker or representative of direct care worker to Quality Measurement Council. Adds direct care worker or representative of direct care worker to Quality Measurement Council. Requires residential care facility to update uniform disclosure statement and submit statement to Department of Human Services any time there is change in management or ownership. Directs department to conduct study of cost of care in, sufficiency of reimbursement paid to and average compensation paid to staff in residential care facilities. Requires department to report results of study to Legislative Assembly by January 1, 2023, and to publicly report aggregate, deidentified data from study. Sunsets on January 2, 2023.
Title
Relating to community-based care providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 655, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williams. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Morgan. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 25, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-24 | House | Rules suspended. Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-23 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-23 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |