OR SB703 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjusts methods by which State School Fund distributions are made to school districts for students enrolled in English as a second language program. Allows for additional weights in State School Fund distributions for students who are enrolled in and earn three or more credits for courses that are part of approved career and technical education program. Allows for additional weights in State School Fund distributions for historically underserved students who have made specified progress in ninth grade. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2015.
Title
Relating to State School Fund distributions; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Hass [D] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] | Rep. Mark Johnson [R] | Rep. Betty Komp [D] |
Rep. Jeff Reardon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Education, then Finance and Revenue. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB703 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB703/Introduced |