OR SB701 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that, for estate of decedents dying on or after January 1, 2019, Oregon estate tax is not due unless value of Oregon taxable estate equals or exceeds $11.4 million. Raises threshold for filing of estate tax return to gross estate valued at or more than $11.4 million. Adjusts exclusion amount and filing threshold for inflation. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to conforming estate tax to federal basic exclusion amount; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB701 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB701/Introduced |