OR SB700 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Sets limit on taxes due on homesteads of seniors living on fixed income equal to total amount of taxes due for property tax year preceding first property tax year for which relief allowed. Abates taxes in excess of limit. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to property taxes due on the homestead of certain seniors; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Rep. Gene Whisnant [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB700 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB700/Introduced |