OR SB70 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 27, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "regional health equity coalition" and "regional health equity coalition model." Requires Oregon Health Authority to work with regional health equity coalitions. Defines "regional health equity coalition" and "regional health equity coalition model." Requires Oregon Health Authority to work with regional health equity coalitions. Appropriates moneys to fund additional grants for organizations seeking to build regional health equity coalitions and to provide additional staff support.] Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to disparities in health outcomes for communities impacted by discrimination; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 47 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 645, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Alonso Leon. Passed. Ayes, 47; Nays, 11--Bonham, Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Moore-Green, Post, Reschke, Wallan, Wright; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Knopp. Passed. Ayes, 23; Nays, 6--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |