OR SB7 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Environmental Quality Commission to adopt rules applying certain oil spill prevention and emergency response planning requirements to high hazard train routes in this state. Adds railroad cars to definition of "facility" for purposes of liability for oil spillage under oil or hazardous material spillage statutes. Defines "high hazard train route" and "listed sensitive area" for purposes of contingency plans. Establishes annual assessment proportioned among certain railroads. Transfers moneys to Oil Spill Prevention Fund for purposes of certain activities related to high hazard train routes. Requires certain railroads to submit annual financial responsibility statement. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to state transport of hazardous materials; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, request rescission of subsequent referral to Finance and Revenue and request referral to Rules (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and rescind referral to Finance and Revenue. Request referral to Rules. Referral to Finance and Revenue rescinded by Order of the President. Referred to Rules by Order of the President. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then Finance and Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |