OR SB697 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribes additional requirements for health benefit plan coverage of telemedical health services. Prescribes additional requirements for health benefit plan coverage of telemedical health services. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to telemedical health services; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB697 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB697/Introduced |