OR SB689 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Oregon estate tax is imposed only on estates of decedents dying on or before June 30, 2019. Provides that Oregon estate tax is imposed only on estates of decedents dying on or before June 30, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to repeal of estate tax imposed on estates of certain decedents; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB689 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB689/Introduced |