OR SB688 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 4 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-07-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs professional licensing board to annually report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to veterans information about temporary authorizations to practice occupational or professional service for spouses or domestic partners of members of Armed Forces of United States who are stationed in this state. Requires professional licensing board to issue temporary authorization to qualified individual.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to professional authorizations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-30 - House - House Repassed (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-30 - Senate - Senate Repassed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Senate concur in House Amendments dated 05/30, further amend and repass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Refuse to Concur (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments and rescind subsequent referral to Business and Labor. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and subsequent referral to Business and General Government be rescinded (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2019-07-03SenatePresident signed.
2019-06-30HouseRepassed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Clem, Noble, Sprenger, Wallan.
2019-06-30HouseHouse adopted Conference Committee Report.
2019-06-30SenateGelser, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye.
2019-06-30SenateSenate adopted Conference Committee Report and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Absent, 2--Girod, Linthicum; Excused, 1--Boles.
2019-06-30HouseConference Committee Report read in House.
2019-06-29SenateConference Committee Recommendation: The Senate concur in House amendments dated 05-30 and A-Engrossed bill be further amended and repassed.
2019-06-29SenateWork Session held.
2019-06-20SenateWork Session cancelled.
2019-06-13HouseRepresentatives Evans, Wilde, Zika appointed House conferees.
2019-06-10SenateSenators Boquist, Monnes Anderson, Olsen appointed Senate conferees.
2019-06-10SenateSenate refused to concur in House amendments. Ayes, 29.
2019-06-04HouseThird reading. Carried by Neron. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 4--Boles, Clem, Hernandez, Speaker Kotek; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Power.
2019-06-03HouseSecond reading.
2019-05-30HouseSubsequent referral to Business and Labor rescinded by order of the Speaker.
2019-05-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, and subsequent referral to Business and Labor be rescinded.
2019-05-23HouseWork Session held.
2019-05-21HouseWork Session held.
2019-04-30HousePublic Hearing held.
2019-04-15HouseReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness with subsequent referral to Business and Labor.
2019-04-08HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2019-04-04SenateThird reading. Carried by Olsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Roblan, Winters.
2019-04-01SenateTaken from 04-01 Calendar and placed on 04-04 Calendar by unanimous consent.
2019-03-28SenateSecond reading.
2019-03-27SenateSubsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
2019-03-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass and subsequent referral to Business and General Government be rescinded.
2019-03-20SenateWork Session held.
2019-03-13SenatePublic Hearing held.
2019-02-01SenateReferred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness, then Business and General Government.
2019-01-29SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB688
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB688/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB688/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB688/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB688/Conference%20Committee%20Amendments%20to%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB688/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/28239
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=456731
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/29718
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=471742
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=473487
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/30232
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478157
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2019R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=478253

Bill Comments

feedback