OR SB686 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes right to receive inpatient psychiatric care in person and on-site. Establishes right to receive inpatient psychiatric care in person and on-site. Requires hospital, state hospital and secure intensive community inpatient facility to inform patients or residents of right to in-person and on-site care and to offer patient or resident choice to receive psychiatric care in person and on-site.
Title
Relating to mental health care.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB686 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB686/Introduced |