OR SB683 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes counties to identify lands that must be made available for industrial use. Authorizes counties to identify lands that must be made available for industrial use. Sunsets January 2, 2028. Sunsets 2011 program under which former Economic Recovery Review Council may designate regionally significant industrial areas.
Title
Relating to industrial lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |