OR SB683 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires state to pay for ballot return envelopes that can be returned by business reply mail for each election held in this state. Applies to elections held on or after January 1, 2019.
Title
Relating to elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Ways and Means (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On General Government. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |