OR SB674 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Oregon Health Authority to investigate best practices and latest technology and to establish hospital procedures to enable family members to visit hospitalized patients during pandemic. Requires Oregon Health Authority to investigate best practices and latest technology and to establish hospital procedures to enable family members to visit hospitalized patients during pandemic. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to hospital visitation during a pandemic; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB674 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB674/Introduced |