OR SB670 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-02 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits name of county clerk or filing officer from appearing in official capacity on voters' pamphlet, return identification envelope, secrecy envelope or other ballot information provided to electors if county clerk or filing officer is on ballot. Prohibits name of Secretary of State,] county clerk or filing officer from appearing in official capacity on voters' pamphlet, return identification envelope, secrecy envelope or other ballot information provided to electors if secretary,] county clerk or filing officer is on ballot. Establishes exception to permit name, office and signature of Secretary of State to appear on cover of voters' pamphlet as part of statement stating that pamphlet may be used to assist electors in voting.] Prohibits name of Secretary of State from appearing in official capacity on return identification envelope, secrecy envelope or other ballot information other than voters' pamphlet that is provided to electors if secretary is on ballot. Permits name of secretary to appear in official capacity in voters' pamphlet.
Title
Relating to information provided to voters.
Sponsors
Sen. Kathleen Taylor [D] | Sen. Rob Wagner [D] | Rep. Andrea Salinas [D] | Rep. Julianne Fahey [D] |
Rep. Karin Power [D] | Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Courtney Neron [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Chapter 508, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Boquist. |
2019-06-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Fahey. Passed. Ayes, 36; Nays, 23--Barreto, Boles, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Drazan, Evans, Findley, Hayden, Helt, Leif, Lewis, McLane, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Stark, Wallan, Wilson, Witt, Zika; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Marsh. |
2019-06-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-06-05 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-30 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-20 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Taylor. Passed. Ayes, 19; Nays, 9--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |