OR SB664 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits agency from imposing civil penalty on small business under certain circumstances.
Title
Relating to prohibiting agencies from imposing civil penalties on small businesses for paperwork violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-05-17 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2017-04-20 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Olsen, Riley. Passed.Ayes, 29; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |