OR SB660 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-28 - Effective date, July 27, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs Oregon Health Authority to promote oral health throughout this state by ensuring availability of dental sealant programs to students attending school in this state. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Oregon Health Authority for purpose of funding oral health activities. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to providing dental services to children; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2015-07-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-02 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. Refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Printed A-Eng) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-28 | Senate | Effective date, July 27, 2015. |
2015-07-28 | Senate | Chapter 791, 2015 Laws. |
2015-07-27 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-07-09 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-07-03 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed.Ayes, 59; Nays, 1--Nearman. |
2015-07-03 | House | Second reading. |
2015-07-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2015-07-02 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2015-07-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2015-07-02 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monnes Anderson. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Dembrow, Olsen. |
2015-07-01 | Senate | Second reading. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-06-19 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |