OR SB654 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Imposes public safety assessment on covered entities. Defines "covered entity." Establishes Public Safety Assessment Fund. Requires certain covered entities to submit copy of return or form that covered entity must submit to obtain exemption from federal taxation if covered entity pays officer or employee more than $1 million. Applies to calendar years beginning on or after January 1, 2019. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to regulation of certain business entities; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Finance and Revenue by prior reference. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government, then Finance and Revenue. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |