OR SB653 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $50 million to State Forestry Department to fund increased forest thinning operations in specified wildfire-prone counties. Appropriates $50 million to State Forestry Department to fund increased forest thinning operations in specified wildfire-prone counties. Directs department to allocate $5 million to fund forest thinning operations on public lands located in each wildfire-prone county. Requires department to confer with county governing body of each county to determine which specific forest thinning operations to fund. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to funding for forest thinning; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 11 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-11SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Golden, Sollman.
2023-04-11SenateMotion to withdraw from committee on Natural Resources failed. Ayes, 11; Nays, 17--Boquist, Campos, Dembrow, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Robinson, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 2--Frederick, Gorsek.
2023-01-14SenateReferred to Natural Resources, then Ways and Means.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback