OR SB651 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 3 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires supervising officer to notify probationer of right to file objection and have hearing concerning officer's proposed modification to special conditions of probation. Requires supervising officer to notify probationer of right to file objection and have hearing concerning officer's proposed modification to special conditions of probation. Provides that] Authorizes probationer or probationer's attorney may] to file objection to proposed modification to special conditions of probation].

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to probation conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-08SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-06-08SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Johnson, Steiner Hayward.
2021-06-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Wright.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-05-18HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-04HouseWork Session held.
2021-04-27HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-24SenateThird reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 23; Absent, 4--Heard, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 3--Boquist, Gorsek, Thomsen.
2021-03-18SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-18SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-03-10SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-10SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-02-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB651
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB651/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB651/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB651/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB651/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31350
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=508060
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32536
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=527193
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=528393

Bill Comments 750

feedback