OR SB649 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-5)
Status: Enrolled on June 7 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-10 - Speaker signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Increases penalties for criminal sexual contact with underage victim when defendant is victim's teacher. Increases penalties for criminal sexual contact with underage victim when defendant is victim's teacher. Punishes by maximum of five years' imprisonment, $125,000 fine, or both. Directs Oregon Criminal Justice Commission to classify certain instances of sexual abuse in the second degree committed by teacher as crime category 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to sexual abuse in the second degree.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-10HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-09SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-07HouseThird reading. Carried by Levy. Passed. Ayes, 56; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Evans.
2021-06-03HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-24HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-24HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-18HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-19HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-12HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-12SenateThird reading. Carried by Hansell, Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Thomsen.
2021-04-08SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-08SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-04-01SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback