OR SB64 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Renames "mental disease or defect" to "qualifying mental disorder" in criminal and certain juvenile statutes.
Title
Relating to health terminology.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-01 - House - House (Y: 50 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Senate concur in House Amendments dated 06/06, further amend and repass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-30 - Senate - Senate (Y: 21 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Senate - Senate Committee Senate concur in House Amendments dated 06/06, further amend and repass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-08-10 | Senate | Chapter 634, 2017 Laws. |
2017-08-02 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-07-05 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-07-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-07-01 | House | Repassed.Ayes, 50; Nays, 6--Heard, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Whisnant, Wilson; Excused, 4--Barreto, Boone, Hayden, Noble. |
2017-07-01 | House | House adopted Conference Committee Report. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Linthicum granted unanimous consent to change vote from aye to nay. |
2017-06-30 | Senate | Senate adopted Conference Committee Report and repassed bill.Ayes, 20; nays, 7--DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher; excused, 3--Monroe, Roblan, Thomsen. |
2017-06-29 | House | Conference Committee Report read in House. |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Recommendation: The Senate concur in House amendments dated 06-06 and B-Engrossed bill be further amended and repassed. |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-06-22 | House | Representatives Barker, Greenlick, Vial appointed House conferees. |
2017-06-20 | Senate | Senators Dembrow, Prozanski, Thatcher appointed Senate conferees. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Motion to refuse to concur in House amendments carried by voice vote. |
2017-06-14 | House | Third reading. Carried by Greenlick. Passed.Ayes, 52; Nays, 4--Clem, Nearman, Reschke, Smith DB; Excused, 3--Bentz, Boone, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 14, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 13, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 12, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-06-07 | House | Second reading. |
2017-06-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-05-30 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-05-08 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-04-27 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-04-25 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Boquist, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote nay . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed.Ayes, 19; nays, 10--Boquist, DeBoer, Ferrioli, Girod, Knopp, Kruse, Linthicum, Olsen, Thatcher, Thomsen; excused, 1--Baertschiger Jr. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |