OR SB639 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for regulation by Oregon Liquor Control Commission of consumption and sale of marijuana items at temporary events, including licensure of premises on which temporary events are held. Creates local option for cities and counties. Provides for regulation by commission of consumption and sale of marijuana items at cannabis lounges, including licensure of premises where cannabis lounges are located. Creates local option for cities and counties. Allows for delivery of marijuana items to consumers at specified permanent and temporary residences. Allows marijuana producers and marijuana processors to offer tours of licensed premises to members of public who are 21 years of age or older. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to marijuana; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Lew Frederick [D] | Sen. Floyd Prozanski [D] | Sen. Shemia Fagan [D] | Sen. Jeffrey Golden [D] |
Sen. Elizabeth Steiner Hayward [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Business and General Government. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB639 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB639/Introduced |