OR SB639 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Restricts use of motor vehicle registration plate surveillance cameras. Provides exceptions. Exempts captured plate data from disclosure under public records law unless public interest requires disclosure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicle registration plate surveillance cameras.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-06SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2015-04-27SenateReferred to Rules by order of the President.
2015-04-27SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.)
2015-04-21SenateWork Session held.
2015-03-17SenatePublic Hearing held.
2015-02-13SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2015-02-12SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback