OR SB639 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, September 29, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to outdoor advertising signs; and prescribing an effective date.
Title
Relating to outdoor advertising signs; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Effective date, September 29, 2011. | |
2011-06-30 | Chapter 562, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-29 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-22 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-16 | President signed. | |
2011-06-15 | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 18; nays, 12--Atkinson, Ferrioli, George, Girod, Johnson, Kruse, Morse, Olsen, Telfer, Thomsen, Whitsett, Winters. | |
2011-06-08 | Potential conflict(s) of interest declared by Speaker Hanna. | |
2011-06-08 | Third reading. Carried by Read. Passed. Ayes, 45; Nays, 13--Brewer, Cannon, Conger, Esquivel, Garrard, Hicks, Johnson, Krieger, Lindsay, Smith J., Weidner, Wingard, Speaker Hanna; Excused, 1--Greenlick; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Tomei. | |
2011-06-07 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-03 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. | |
2011-06-01 | Work Session held. | |
2011-05-25 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-25 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-03-07 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-03-03 | Starr declared potential conflict of interest. | |
2011-03-03 | Third reading. Carried by Starr. Passed. Ayes, 29; nays, 1--George. | |
2011-03-02 | Second reading. | |
2011-03-02 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-02-28 | Public Hearing and Work Session held. | |
2011-02-11 | Referred to Business, Transportation and Economic Development. | |
2011-02-08 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |