OR SB638 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes discrimination against individual based on vaccination history, individual's refusal to obtain vaccination or individual's failure to provide proof of immunity to communicable disease unlawful employment practice. Makes discrimination against individual based on vaccination history, individual's refusal to obtain vaccination or individual's failure to provide proof of immunity to communicable disease unlawful employment practice. Allows civil action for violation against unlawful employment practice.
Title
Relating to employment discrimination based on vaccination status.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] | Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Withdraw from Committee (Y: 12 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Sollman. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Motion to withdraw from committee on Health Care failed. Ayes, 12; Nays, 16--Campos, Dembrow, Frederick, Gelser Blouin, Golden, Jama, Lieber, Manning Jr, Meek, Patterson, Prozanski, Sollman, Steiner, Taylor, Woods, President Wagner; Excused, 2--Findley, Gorsek. |
2023-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |