OR SB633 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Failed on July 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-08 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Makes legislative finding and declaration that regulation of agricultural seed, flower seed, nursery seed and vegetable seed and products of agricultural seed, flower seed, nursery seed and vegetable seed be reserved to state.
Title
Relating to the preemption of local laws regulating agriculture.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hansell [R] | Sen. Elizabeth Johnson [D] | Sen. Jeff Kruse [R] | Sen. Arnie Roblan [D] |
Sen. Herman Baertschiger [R] | Rep. Gregory Smith [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-08 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2013-05-08 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2013-05-02 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 17; nays, 12--Bates, Burdick, Devlin, Dingfelder, Edwards, Hass, Monnes Anderson, Monroe, Prozanski, Rosenbaum, Shields, Steiner Hayward; excused, 1--Johnson. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Taken from 04-30 Calendar and placed on 05-01 Calendar on voice vote. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Rural Communities and Economic Development. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |