OR SB630 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes issuance of lottery bonds and transfer of net proceeds to Oregon Business Development Department. Authorizes issuance of lottery bonds and transfer of net proceeds to Oregon Business Development Department. Directs department to use proceeds to develop pilot program to award grants to developers for development of housing on former landfill sites. Requires grant recipient to indemnify state for claims arising from activities of recipient for which grant was awarded. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the development of landfill sites; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-24SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-03-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2023-03-21SenateWork Session held.
2023-02-16SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-15SenateReferred to Energy and Environment, then Ways and Means.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB630
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB630/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB630/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB630/A-Engrossed
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23420
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76174
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76661
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66581
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76176
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/75873
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/76355
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261579
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/261372
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266241
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266244
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/266245
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/34703

Bill Comments

feedback