OR SB629 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Allows pharmacist to use telepharmacy to deliver pharmacy services to patient at remote location. Allows pharmacist to use telepharmacy to deliver pharmacy services to patient at remote location. Defines "telepharmacy." Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to telepharmacy; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateEffective date, September 25, 2021.
2021-06-30SenateChapter 340, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-15SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 1--Smith G; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-25HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-25HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-20HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-23HouseReferred to Health Care.
2021-04-19HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-19SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-04-19SenateThird reading. Carried by Hansell. Passed. Ayes, 29; Nays, 1--Heard.
2021-04-15SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-04-05SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-29SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-24SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Health Care.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback