OR SB628 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes Land Conservation and Development Commission to approve plans for urban growth boundary expansion to accommodate affordable housing in Pendleton. Authorizes Land Conservation and Development Commission to approve plans for urban growth boundary expansion to accommodate affordable housing in Pendleton. Sunsets affordable housing pilot program on January 2, 2028. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to expansion of urban growth boundaries to accommodate affordable housing; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Energy and Environment. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB628 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB628/Introduced |