OR SB625 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to establish pilot program for evaluating use of challenge-based procurement to conduct certain information technology procurements. Requires Oregon Department of Administrative Services to establish pilot program for evaluating use of challenge-based procurement to conduct certain information technology procurements. Specifies features that pilot program must have. Requires contracting agencies that use challenge-based procurement method to provide sufficient information to department to allow department to evaluate and report results of pilot program to Governor and to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to public procurement not later than December 31, 2025. Sunsets January 2, 2026. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to methods of public procurement; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-04-21SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-04-21SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2023-04-19SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-29SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-15SenateReferred to Information Management and Technology, then Ways and Means.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB625
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB625/Introduced
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66576
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267114
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/268568
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78316
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270561
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/270632
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78599
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78672
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35389

Bill Comments

feedback