OR SB624 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Joint Interim Legislative Committee to Review Economic Development Programs in Oregon. Directs committee to study and compile data regarding economic development programs, determine effectiveness of programs and develop recommendations for consistent, statewide evaluation process. Requires report to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to business and economic development no later than September 15, 2018. Allows committee to introduce legislation to implement recommendations. Sunsets committee on December 31, 2018. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to evaluation of economic development programs in Oregon; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Business and Transportation, then Rules, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback