OR SB623 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, June 11, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Workforce and Talent Development Board to establish Committee for Continuous Improvement to assess effectiveness of Oregon's public workforce development system. Requires local workforce development boards to evaluate programs administered by state workforce agencies through WorkSource Oregon system. Requires agencies to provide boards with information for performance evaluation.] Requires annual report to Legislative Assembly and Governor listing all programs delivered through WorkSource Oregon and identifying program problems and potential solutions.] Requires state workforce agencies to annually provide to each local workforce development board information on amount of fund availability and services provided by agencies in each local workforce development area. Requires agencies to also provide to boards quarterly expenditure and performance information for each workforce program delivered by agency through WorkSource Oregon.] Requires state workforce agencies to implement all recommendations made by local workforce development board during program evaluation, unless recommendation is prohibited by federal or state law.] Requires Governor to collaborate with members of Legislative Assembly to establish funding formula to support WorkSource Oregon evaluation.] Authorizes Higher Education Coordinating Commission to provide grants to local workforce development boards for paid work experiences for youth.] Authorizes commission to establish pilot programs to provide grants to local workforce development boards to work with organizations to enhance adult learning.] Requires State Workforce and Talent Development Board to convene representatives from state workforce agencies and local workforce development boards to identify program and system changes to support individuals and business most impacted by COVID-19 pandemic and 2020 wildfire disasters. Requires report on findings to be submitted to Governor and Legislative Assembly within 45 days of effective date of Act.] Directs State Workforce and Talent Development Board to establish Committee for Continuous Improvement to assess effectiveness of Oregon's public workforce development system. Requires committee to identify and contract with independent third-party entity to conduct assessment and develop recommendations prioritizing needs of individuals and businesses most impacted by COVID-19 pandemic, no later than September 30, 2021. Sets forth requirements for developing recommendations. Requires committee to submit to State Workforce and Talent Development Board report that includes results of assessment and recommendations. Directs board to approve report and submit copy of report to Governor and interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to workforce development, no later than 45 days after receipt of report. Requires that, once every even-numbered year, Committee for Continuous Improvement identify and contract with independent third-party entity to conduct comprehensive assessment of Oregon's public workforce system and make recommendations for improvements. Establishes requirements for comprehensive assessment. Requires committee to present results of each assessment, along with recommendations for improvements, in reports to Governor and interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to workforce development, on or before December 15 of each even-numbered year. Requires committee to include in first report submitted to Governor and committees of Legislative Assembly update regarding implementation of recommendations from initial assessment. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to workforce development; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, June 11, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 280, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-01 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 2--Clem, Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Holvey, Rayfield, Speaker Kotek, Stark. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-24 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-06 | House | Referred to Economic Recovery and Prosperity. |
2021-04-29 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Kennemer. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Taken from 04-22 Calendar and placed on 04-28 Calendar on voice vote. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |