OR SB623 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits types of new vehicles person may register on and after January 1, 2025, if person resides in county with large population.
Title
Relating to motor vehicle registration.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Girod [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB623 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB623/Introduced |