OR SB623 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Effective date, January 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revises and clarifies requirements for petition to adopt minor child.
Title
Relating to adoption proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2014. |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Chapter 346, 2013 Laws. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Williamson. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused, 1--Gelser. |
2013-05-29 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 30, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-28 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 29, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-21 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2013 Calendar. |
2013-05-20 | House | Second reading. |
2013-05-17 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2013-05-14 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2013-04-30 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-04-24 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Close. Passed. Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Johnson, Shields, Winters. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Second reading. |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |