OR SB622 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
Pending: Joint Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes issuance of $10 million in lottery bonds for deposit in Levee Project Grant Fund to be used to provide grants for levee projects. Authorizes issuance of $10 million in lottery bonds for deposit in Levee Project Grant Fund to be used to provide grants for levee projects. Requires at least 60 percent of dollar value of grants awarded from Levee Project Grant Fund to be used to provide assistance with levee projects to rural or distressed areas. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to levees; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and refer to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-24SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-24SenateRecommendation: Do pass and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2021-03-18SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development, then Ways and Means.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback